Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1176570 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2002 | A3 | EP1176570 | 30.01.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20001745 | 28.07.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1318273 | 28.07.2003 | B1 | ITMI20001745 | 28.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20001745 | 28.07.2000 |