EP1186481 - Roll over protection device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISE Innomotive Systems Europe GmbH Othestrasse 19 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | [2002/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beki, Gürkan Hauptstrasse 2 51702 Bergneustadt / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118213.6 | 28.07.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE2000144930 | 12.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044930 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186481 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186481 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186481 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1186481 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/13 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B60R21/13 (EP);
B60R2021/135 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT [2006/52] |
Former [2006/40] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Überrollschutzsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2002/11] | English: | Roll over protection device for vehicles | [2002/11] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre le retournement pour véhicules | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 29.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5236219 (JAMBOR ARNO [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE4342400 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]WO9748579 (HYDRO RAUFOSS AUTOMOTIVE AS [NO], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE19712955 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [PA]EP1095823 (ISE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1* figure - * | by applicant | DE4100506 | DE4342400 | DE19781833T |