EP1279609 - Opening device for package for pourable food products, and package including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430 1009 Pully / CH | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martini, Pietro Via Scola, 39 43100 Parma / IT | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01118302.7 | 27.07.2001 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279609 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279609 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B65D5/746 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/05] | Title | German: | Öffnungsmittel an einer Verpackung für fliessfähige Nahrungsmittel und damit ausgestattete Verpackung | [2003/05] | English: | Opening device for package for pourable food products, and package including the same | [2003/05] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture pour un récipient de produits alimentaires coulants et récipient comprenant un tel dispositif | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 01.02.2006 | CH | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | LI | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | TR | 01.02.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | PT | 03.07.2006 | GB | 27.07.2006 | IE | 27.07.2006 | LU | 27.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
TR | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.07.2006 | ||
IE | 27.07.2006 | ||
LU | 27.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.07.2006 | ||
IE | 27.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.07.2006 | ||
IE | 27.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.07.2006 | ||
IE | 27.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.07.2006 | ||
IE | 27.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
IE | 27.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BE | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
LI | 01.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2738552 (RICAL SA [FR]) [X] 1,10 * figure 2 *; | [XA]DE19711578 (PKL VERPACKUNGSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 4 * [A] 2; | [XY]WO9921767 (TERXO AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 7, line 14 - line 20; figure 7 * [Y] 8; | [Y]JPH11334753 (NIHON TETRAPAK KK) [Y] 8 * figure 6 *; | [E]DE10017467 (AHRENS ELVIRA [DE], et al) [E] 1,10* column 3, line 32 - line 36; figure 13 * |