EP1239089 - Shower provided with a luminous shower head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannarino, Emilio Via Mantova No. 33 10153 Torino / IT | [2002/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/37] | Representative(s) | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent S.R.L. Via Caboto, 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/37] | Robba, Pierpaolo, et al Interpatent, Via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 01118325.8 | 27.07.2001 | [2002/37] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00208 | 09.03.2001 Original published format: IT TO010208 | [2002/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239089 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1239089 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/04 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
E03C1/0404 (EP);
F21V33/004 (EP);
F21V9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/14] |
Former [2002/37] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Dusche, versehen mit leuchtendem Duschkopf | [2002/37] | English: | Shower provided with a luminous shower head | [2002/37] | French: | Douche équipée avec pomme de douche lumineuse | [2002/37] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2220567 (CARADON MIRA LTD [GB]) [Y] 7 * page 5, line 7 - line 19 *; | [X]GB2288974 (LI LIN [GB]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5479558 (WHITE JR JAMES A [US], et al) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 17 * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US6021960 (KEHAT JOEL [IL]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 13 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO0030759 (MASCO CORP [US], et al) [A] 5 * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 2 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US6126290 (VEIGEL GUNTER [DE]) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 48 * * figures 1A,,1B,,5 * [Y] 7,8; | [PX]DE20101460U (JEZEWSKI LARS [DE]) [PX] 1,3,7,8 * page 2, paragraph L ** figure . *; | [E]WO0177577 (GASPAROTTO MARIA PALMA [IT]) [E] 1-6,9 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 14 * * abstract * |