EP1177999 - Fixed station sorter/mailbox with passive gate station entrance system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2005/52] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation, Patent Department Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mandel, Barry P. 3707 Atlantic Avenue Fairport, New York 14450 / US | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118548.5 | 01.08.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | US20000632275 | 03.08.2000 Original published format: US 632275 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177999 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177999 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177999 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H39/11, B65H15/00 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
B65H39/11 (EP,US);
B65H15/008 (EP,US);
B65H2301/3331 (EP,US);
B65H2408/111 (EP,US);
B65H2801/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Briefverteilungs- und sortiervorrichtung mit ortfesten Behältern und passivem Verschlussystem am Behältereingang | [2002/06] | English: | Fixed station sorter/mailbox with passive gate station entrance system | [2002/06] | French: | Système de tri et de postage avec casiers à poste fixe et sytème passif de barrière à l'entrée des casiers | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4428572 (BURKE ANTHONY E [GB]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5938194 (COOMBS PETER M [US], et al) [A] * column 1, lines 40-67 * |