EP1186856 - Device for measuring profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/11] | Device for profiles measurement | ||
[2008/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pieper, Siegfried Pfeddersheimer Strasse 95 67549 Worms / DE | For all designated states Rottner, Franz Tuchschererstrasse 7 67551 Worms / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states INNOtec Europe GmbH Tuchschererstrasse 7-9 67551 Worms / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/21] |
Former [2002/11] | 01 /
Pieper, Siegfried Tuchschererstrasse 7 67551 Worms / DE | ||
02 /
Rottner, Franz Tuchschererstrasse 7 67551 Worms / DE | Representative(s) | Thews, Gustav, et al STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Thews, Gustav, et al Sartorius, Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/02] | Thews, Karl, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Sartorius - Thews & Thews Helmholtzstrasse 35 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | ||
Former [2002/11] | Sartorius, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Allgeier & Sartorius Elisabethenstrasse 24 68535 Neckarhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118570.9 | 02.08.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE2000144157 | 06.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044157 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186856 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186856 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186856 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B15/04, G01B17/06, B61K9/02 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
B61K9/02 (EP);
G01B11/24 (EP);
G01B21/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/11] | G01B11/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Messen von Profilen | [2002/11] | English: | Device for measuring profiles | [2008/16] | French: | Dispositif de mesure des profils | [2002/11] |
Former [2002/11] | Device for profiles measurement | Examination procedure | 26.11.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | IT | 01.10.2008 | NL | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | ES | 12.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 01.10.2008 | |
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 12.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19646098 (LAUCK LOTHAR DR [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5903355 (SCHWARZ FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1* column 4 - column 6; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US4699478 | by applicant | DE3005493 | DE3624782 | DE4015086 | US5903355 |