EP1148050 - Retroviral protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clare, Michael 5154 West Brown Street Skokie, IL 60077 / US | 02 /
Decrescenzo, Gary Anthony 536 Schrader Farm Drive St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 03 /
Freskos, John Nicholas 7572 York Clayton, MO 63105 / US | 04 /
Getman, Daniel Paul 66 Sunny Hill Court Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 05 /
Heintz, Robert Martin 603 Nancy Place Ballwin, MO 63021 / US | 06 /
Lin, Ko-Chung 345 Vassar Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 07 /
Mueller, Richard August 562 Stonegate Terrace Glencoe, IL 60022 / US | 08 /
Reed, Kathryn Lea 7301-104 Brookmont Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 09 /
Rogier, Donald Joseph, Jr. 2346 Halfmoon Drive, Apartment 1 St. Louis, MO 63114 / US | 10 /
Talley, John Jeffrey 1079 Darwick Court St. Louis, MO 63132 / US | 11 /
Vazquez, Michael Lawrence 233 Saratoga Court Gurnee, IL 60031 / US | [2001/43] | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Strych, Werner Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 70 08 60 81308 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/43] | Beil, Hans Christoph, Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40 65901 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118721.8 | 04.05.1993 | [2001/43] | Priority number, date | US19920886700 | 21.05.1992 Original published format: US 886700 | [2001/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1148050 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D217/26, A61K31/47 | [2001/43] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP,US);
C07D211/60 (EP,US);
C07D217/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2001/43] | Title | German: | Retrovirale Proteaseinhibitoren | [2001/43] | English: | Retroviral protease inhibitors | [2001/43] | French: | Inhibiteurs de protéase rétroviraux | [2001/43] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/47] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93911046.6 / EP0641325 | EP99113622.7 / EP0957093 | Divisional application(s) | EP04005829.9 / EP1447398 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2002 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0346847 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-81 * claim - *; | [X]EP0432695 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-81 * claims --81 *; | [PA]WO9208688 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [PA] 1-81* claim - *; | [X] - NOEL A ROBERTS ET AL, "Rational design of peptide-based HIV proteinase inhibitors", SCIENCE., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC., US, (19900420), vol. 248, pages 358 - 361, XP002129542 [X] 1-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.2183354 | [A] - TIM.F.TAM ET AL, "Intriguing structure-activity relations underlie the potent inhibition of HIV protease by norstatine-based peptides", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (19920403), vol. 35, no. 7, pages 1318 - 1320, XP002129543 [A] 1-81 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00085a020 |