EP1285918 - C7 Ester substituted taxanes as antitumor agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Florida State University Research Foundation, Inc. 100 Sliger Building, MC 2763 Tallahassee Florida 32306-2763 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states Florida State University Research Foundation, Inc. 100 Sliger Building, MC 2763 Tallahassee, Florida 32306-2763 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holton, Robert A. 7125 Upland Glade Tallahassee, Florida 32312 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Maiwald, Walter Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118729.1 | 06.08.2001 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285918 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D407/12, A61K31/335, A61P35/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
C07D305/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | C7-Estersubstituierte Taxane als Antitumormittel | [2003/09] | English: | C7 Ester substituted taxanes as antitumor agents | [2003/09] | French: | Taxanes substitués par ester en C7 utilisés comme agents anticancereux | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/51] | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5415869 (STRAUBINGER ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-178 * claims 6,16,22 *; | [X]WO9513053 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-178 * claim 8 *; | [X]WO9744063 (NEUROMEDICA INC [US]) [X] 1-178 * claims 10,16-18 *; | [X]WO9744026 (NEUROMEDICA INC [US]) [X] 1-178 * claims 6,12 *; | [X]WO0001366 (NEOPHARM [US], et al) [X] 1-178 * claim 2 *; | [X]WO0125223 (UNIV NEW YORK STATE RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-178 * claim 5 *; | [X]US2001002404 (WEBB NIGEL L [US], et al) [X] 1-178 * page 11 *; | [E]WO0157013 (UNIV FLORIDA STATE RES FOUND [US]) [E] 1-178 * claims 1-123 *; | [E]WO0157027 (UNIV FLORIDA STATE RES FOUND [US]) [E] 1-178 * claims 1-177 *; | [X] - B.-X. SHI ET AL., "Studies on the Quantitative Structure-activity Relationships of Paclitaxel Analogues", GOADENG XUEXIAO HUAXUE XUEBAO, (2000), vol. 21, no. 3, pages 401 - 406, XP000999959 [X] 1-178 * table 1 * | [X] - J. DUBOIS ET AL., "Fluorescent and Biotinylated Analogues of Docetaxel: Synthesis and Biological Evaluation", BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1357 - 1368, XP001022129 [X] 1-178 * Scheme I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0896(95)00115-W | [X] - J. DUBOIS ET AL., "Fluorescent and Biotinylated Analogues of Docetaxel: Synthesis and Biological Evaluation", BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 3, no. 10, pages 1357 - 1368, XP000999888 [X] 1-178 * Scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0968-0896(95)00115-W | [X] - D. GUENARD ET AL., "Effects of the Hydrophobicity of Taxoids on their Interaction with Tubulin", BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 145 - 156, XP001000434 [X] 1-178 * tables 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0968-0896(99)00279-5 | [X] - F. GUERITTE-VOEGELEIN ET AL., "Relationships between the Structue of Taxol Analogues and Their Antimitotic Activity", J. MED. CHEM., (1991), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 992 - 998, XP000650581 [X] 1-178 * tables I,II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00107a017 | [X] - FERLINI, C. ET AL, "Antitumor activity of novel taxanes that act at the same time as cytotoxi agents and P-glycoprotein inhibitors", BR. J. CANCER (2000), 83(12), 1762-1768, XP001029698 [X] 1-178 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/bjoc.2000.1500 |