EP1201699 - Process for preparing aminofunctional siloxanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | [2003/15] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states Consortium für elektrochemische Industrie GmbH Zielstattstrasse 20 81379 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schäfer, Oliver Dr. Waldfriedhofstrasse 12 81377 München / DE | 02 /
Frey, Volker Dr. Jahnweg 5 84489 Burghausen / DE | 03 /
Pachaly, Bernd Dr. Utzenstrasse 1 84561 Mehring-Öd / DE | 04 /
Bauer, Andreas Dr. Brudermühlstrasse 50 81371 München / DE | [2003/14] |
Former [2002/18] | 01 /
Schäfer, Oliver, Dr. Waldfriedhofstrasse 12 81377 München / DE | ||
02 /
Frey, Volker, Dr. Jahnweg 5 84489 Burghausen / DE | |||
03 /
Pachaly, Bernd, Dr. Utzenstrasse 1 84561 Mehring-Öd / DE | |||
04 /
Bauer, Andreas, Dr. Brudermühlstrasse 50 81371 München / DE | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Fritz, Helmut, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung Patente, Marken und Lizenzen, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01118780.4 | 09.08.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | DE2000151886 | 19.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10051886 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1201699 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1201699 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/388, C07F7/08 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
C07F7/0874 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/04] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Herstellung von aminofunktionellen Siloxanen | [2002/18] | English: | Process for preparing aminofunctional siloxanes | [2002/18] | French: | Procédé de préparation de siloxanes à fonction amino | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 09.08.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 26.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3146250 (SPEIER JOHN L) [DA] 1-7 * column W *; | [DA]DE3546376 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [DA] 1-7* the whole document * |