EP1187215 - Vertical non-volatile semiconductor memory cell and method for manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2010/22] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gratz, Achim Hauptstrasse 2 98587 Steinbach-Hallenberg / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Kindermann, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Karl-Böhm-Strasse 1 85598 Baldham / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119172.3 | 08.08.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE2000141749 | 27.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041749 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1187215 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1187215 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8246 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
H10B69/00 (EP,US);
H01L29/788 (KR);
H10B41/30 (EP,US);
H10B41/35 (EP,US);
H10B12/038 (EP,US);
H10B12/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2006/03] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vertikale nichtflüchtige Halbleiter-Speicherzelle sowie Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2002/11] | English: | Vertical non-volatile semiconductor memory cell and method for manufacture thereof | [2002/11] | French: | Cellule de mémoire semi-conductrice non-volatile verticale et son procédé de fabrication | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0560069 (IBM [US]); | [XA]EP0562257 (IBM [US]); | [YA]US5386132 (WONG CHUN C D [US]); | [YA]USRE35810E (PRALL KIRK D [US]) |