EP1190892 - Motor vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Kiel GmbH & Co. KG Nürnberger Strasse 62 86720 Nördlingen / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mill, Juergen Rostocker Strasse 39 73479 Ellwangen / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/13] | Lorenz, Werner, Dr.-Ing. Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2-4 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119182.2 | 09.08.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000216389U | 20.09.2000 Original published format: DE 20016389 U | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1190892 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1190892 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/24, B60N2/68 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
B60N2/242 (EP);
B60N2/803 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] | Title | German: | Sitz für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2002/13] | English: | Motor vehicle seat | [2002/13] | French: | Siège pour un véhicule automobile | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 29.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | FR | 14.04.2004 | GB | 14.04.2004 | IE | 14.04.2004 | IT | 14.04.2004 | NL | 14.04.2004 | TR | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | AT | 09.08.2004 | LU | 09.08.2004 | BE | 31.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | CY | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
IT | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
TR | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 09.08.2004 | ||
LU | 09.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CY | 14.04.2004 | |
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
TR | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 09.08.2004 | ||
LU | 09.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
TR | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 09.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 09.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
AT | 09.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 14.04.2004 | |
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3744843 (BARECKI C, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 34; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US3877749 (SAKURAI KATSUO, et al) [A] 1-5,10 * abstract *; | [A]US4252341 (BARECKI CHESTER J, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB2315408 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]); | [A]US5836547 (KOCH ROGER [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 26 - column 8, line 40; figures 2-4 * |