EP1180455 - Voltage supply for a sensor unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mader, Gerhard, Dr. Ringstrasse 21 93107 Thalmassing / DE | [2002/08] | Application number, filing date | 01119524.5 | 14.08.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | DE2000139949 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10039949 | [2002/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1180455 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1180455 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H02J1/02, H03H1/02 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
G01P15/08 (EP,US);
H02J1/02 (EP,US);
B60R16/03 (EP,US);
H02J2310/46 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/08] | B60R16/02, H02J1/02 | Designated contracting states | [2005/40] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spannungsversorgung für eine Sensoreinheit | [2002/08] | English: | Voltage supply for a sensor unit | [2002/08] | French: | L'alimentation en tension pour une unité de détection | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2464376 (MONTE COHEN, et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 18 * * abstract *; | [X]FR1314713 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-7 * page 1, paragraphs 2-4 ** abstract *; | [X]US3273027 (BOURGAULT PIERRE L, et al) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 25 - line 29 * * abstract *; | [X]DE1265890 (TESLA NP) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 7 * * abstract *; | [X]GB1155715 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 13 - line 40 * * page 1, line 53 - line 57 * * abstract * * page 2, line 37 - line 43 * |