EP1192946 - Use of mometasone furoate for treating airway passage and lung diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sequeira, Joel A. 1953 Farmingdale Road Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US | 02 /
Nolop, Keith B. 44 Southern Scope Drive Milburn, New Jersey 07041 / US | 03 /
Nagabhushan, Nagamani 3 Sunset Lane Parsippany, New Jersey 07054 / US | 04 /
Cuss, Francis M. 14 Byron Drive Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 05 /
Chaudry, Imtiaz A. 18 Rose Avenue North Caldwell, New Jersey 07006 / US | 06 /
Patrick, James E. 104 Blawenborg Road Belle Meade, New Jersey 08502 / US | 07 /
Cayen, Mitchell 99 Autumn Ridge Road Bedminster, New Jersey 07921 / US | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | von Menges, Albrecht Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | von Menges, Albrecht Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/14] | Schlich, George William, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01119615.1 | 26.01.1995 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | US19940188372 | 27.01.1994 Original published format: US 188372 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1192946 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/57 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
A61K9/0075 (EP);
A61K31/58 (EP,FI);
A61K31/57 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (EP);
A61K9/0073 (FI);
A61K9/008 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Mometason-Furoat zur Behandlung von Luftweg- und Lungenerkrankungen | [2002/14] | English: | Use of mometasone furoate for treating airway passage and lung diseases | [2002/14] | French: | Utilisation du furoate de mometasone pour le traitement des affections pulmonaires et des voies respiratoires | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2012 | 08.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/14] | 18.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 20.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95909242.0 / EP0740550 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950909242) is 19.11.1996 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9114422 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]WO9206706 (LEZDEY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1 *; | [X]EP0518601 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 25 - line 33; claim 14 *; | [X]EP0518600 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 5, line 37 - line 45; claim 14 *; | [X] - C.J.WANG ET AL., "A Sensitive Enzyme Immunoassay (EIA) for Quantitation of Mometasone Furoate (SCH 32088) Directly in Biological Fluids", FASEB J., (1992), vol. 6, no. 4, page A1302, XP002183700 [X] 1-7 * abstract * | [X] - I.M.RICHARDS ET AL., "Novel steroid-based inhibitors of lung inflammation", CLIN.EXP.ALLERGY, (19920410), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 432 - 439, XP002183701 [X] 1-7 * page 434, column R * | [X] - H.J.LEE ET AL., "ANTI-INFLAMMATORY STEROIDS: RESEARCH TRENDS AND NEW COMPOUNDS", DRUGS TODAY, (198909), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 577 - 588, XP002183702 [X] 1-7 * page 580, column L * | [XP] - D.DEBROVNER, "WHY ASTHMATICS NEED YOU", AM. DRUG., (199408), vol. 210, no. 4, pages 24 - 27, XP002183703 [XP] 1-7 * page 27, column L * | [T] - M. DROUIN ET AL., "Once daily mometasone furoate aqueous nasal spray is as effective as twice daily beclomethasone dipropionate for treating perennial allergic rhinitis patients", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, Database accession no. PMID 8760782, XP002183704 [T] 1 * abstract * | [A] - H.A.ORGEL ET AL., "Clinical, rhinimanometric, and cytologic evaluation of seasonal allergic rhinitis treated with beclomethasone dipropionate as aqueous nasal spray or pressurized aerosol", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, Database accession no. PMID 3711553, XP002183707 [A] 1 * abstract * | [ ] - ANN ALLERGY ASTHMA IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 153 - 160 | [ ] - J ALLERGY CLIN IMMUNOL, (1986), vol. 77, no. 6, pages 858 - 864 |