EP1191098 - Pharmaceutical composition comprising dystrophin exon 45 for treatment of duchenne muscular dystrophy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/13] | Pharmaceutical composition for treatment of duchenne muscular dystrophy | ||
[2005/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JCR PHARMACEUTICALS Co., LTD. 3-19 Kasuga-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo 659-0021 / JP | For all designated states Matsuo, Masafumi 3-31, Kitaochiai 5-chome, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0151 / JP | [2006/12] |
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states JCR PHARMACEUTICALS CO., LTD. 3-19, Kasuga-cho Ashiya, Hyogo 659-0021 / JP | ||
For all designated states Matsuo, Masafumi 3-31, Kitaochiai 5-chome, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuo, Masafumi 3-31, Kitaochiai 5-chome, Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 654-0151 / JP | 02 /
Kamei, Shoichiro 19-6-201, Kitabefu 3-chome, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2117 / JP | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | Behnisch, Werner, Dr. Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01119696.1 | 23.08.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | JP20000256547 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000256547 | [2002/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191098 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191098 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191098 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1191098 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, A61P21/00, A61K31/7125, A61K48/00, C07H21/00 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/4708 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/29] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit Dystrophin Exon 45 zur Behandlung von Duchenne-Muskeldystrophie | [2005/44] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition comprising dystrophin exon 45 for treatment of duchenne muscular dystrophy | [2005/44] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique comprenant exon 45 pour le traitement de la dystrophie musculaire de Duchenne | [2005/44] |
Former [2002/13] | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von Duchenne-Muskeldystrophie | ||
Former [2002/13] | Pharmaceutical composition for treatment of duchenne muscular dystrophy | ||
Former [2002/13] | Composition pharmaceutique pour le traitement de la dystrophie musculaire de Duchenne | Examination procedure | 23.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 23.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8906286 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1,4-16 * page 1, line 10 - line 14 * * page 4, line 27 - line 34 * * claims 16,32 *; | [X]EP0364255 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US]) [X] 1 * claims 13-17 * * page 2, line 16 - line 44 *; | [A]US5449616 (CAMPBELL KEVIN P [US], et al) [A] 4-18 * column 1, line 19 - line 26 * * column 1, line 50 - line 64 * * claim 1 *; | [PA]EP1054058 (JAPAN CHEM RES [JP], et al); | [PA]EP1160318 (JAPAN CHEM RES [JP], et al); | [E]US6426186 (JONES KAREN A [GB], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - TAKESHIMA Y ET AL, "MODULATION OF IN VITRO SPLICING OF THE UPSTREAM INTRON BY MODIFYINGAN INTRA-EXON SEQUENCE WHICH IS DELETED FROM THE DYSTROPHIN GENE INDYSTROPHIN KOBE", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199502), vol. 95, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 515 - 520, XP000939311 [A] * page 515, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 519, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI117693 | [X] - KOENIG, M. ET AL, "The complete sequence of dystrophin predicts a rod-shaped cytoskeletal protein", CELL (CAMBRIDGE, MA, UNITED STATES) (1988), 53(2), 219-28, XP002949075 [X] 1 * page 219, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(88)90383-2 | [X] - KANAMORI, HIROSHI ET AL, "In vitro genetic analysis of the RNA binding site of vigilin, a multi-KH-domain protein", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY (1998), 18(7), 3991-4003, XP001157892 [X] 1 * page 3992 * |