EP1188488 - Process and apparatus for facing a manufactured article through powder coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trevisan Cometal S.p.A. Via Meucci 4 37100 Verona / IT | [2004/51] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Trevisan Spa 4, Via Meucci 37135 Verona / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trevisan, Silvio Via Mantovana 103 37136 Verona / IT | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Rapisardi, Mariacristina, et al Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni 12 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Rapisardi, Mariacristina, et al Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l., Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/17] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano, et al c/o Dr.Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Via D. Manin, 5 37122 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2003/37] | Rapisardi, Mariacristina, et al Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l., Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/12] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano, et al Reniero, Bergamini & Partners s.r.l., 21, Via A. Sciesa 37122 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 01119731.6 | 27.08.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | IT2000VR00085 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: IT VR000085 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1188488 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1188488 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188488 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/40, B05D5/06, B05B15/04, B05C19/06 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B05D1/40 (EP);
B05B14/10 (EP);
B05C19/06 (EP);
B05D5/061 (EP);
B05B16/20 (EP);
B05D7/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | B05D1/40, B05D5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beschichtung eines Artikels mittels Pulverbeschichtung | [2004/17] | English: | Process and apparatus for facing a manufactured article through powder coating | [2002/12] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour revêtir un article par poudrage | [2002/12] |
Former [2002/12] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum beschichten eines Artikels durch Pulverbeschichtung | Examination procedure | 23.09.2003 | Observations by third parties | 30.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 26.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2006 | BE | 08.02.2006 | CH | 08.02.2006 | CY | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | FR | 08.02.2006 | IT | 08.02.2006 | LI | 08.02.2006 | NL | 08.02.2006 | TR | 08.02.2006 | DK | 08.05.2006 | SE | 08.05.2006 | DE | 09.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | GB | 27.08.2006 | LU | 27.08.2006 | IE | 28.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
TR | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.08.2006 | ||
LU | 27.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
GB | 27.08.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
IE | 28.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
DE | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
DK | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
NL | 08.02.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4508763 (SHEMENSKI KENNETH L [US]) [A] 1-22* column 2, lines 12-34; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5169686 (MCKINNON GORDON [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 68; claim -- *; | [A]GB2333974 (ROBOBOND LTD [GB]) [A] 1-22 * claim -- * | Examination | WO9705965 | other | EP0843598 |