EP1184494 - Texturing nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trützschler Switzerland AG c/o Swiss Tex Winterthur AG Schlosstalstrasse 45 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Trützschler Switzerland AG c/o Swiss Tex Winterthur AG Schlosstalstrasse 45 8406 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wirz, Armin Im Grund 8475 Ossingen / CH | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120208.2 | 23.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | DE2000143002 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10043002 | [2002/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184494 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184494 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184494 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/16, D02G1/12 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
D02G1/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | D02G1/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [2004/26] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Texturierdüse | [2002/10] | English: | Texturing nozzle | [2002/10] | French: | Buse de texturation | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 12.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2009
17.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2009
17.09.2009
ADMISSIBLE Oerlikon Textile GmbH & Co. KG Leverkuser Strasse 65 42897 Remscheid / DE Opponent's representative Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | 22.10.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.11.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.11.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.07.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/44] | Appeal following opposition | 21.01.2011 | Appeal received No. T0160/11 | 08.03.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.07.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 11.07.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.07.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 17.12.2008 | BE | 31.08.2009 | [2010/31] |
Former [2009/26] | NL | 17.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO7900956 (RIETER DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0163039 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0554642 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figure 6 *; | [A]WO9411551 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0874072 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * column 10, lines 5-33; figures 10,11 *; | [A]EP1028183 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0045] *; | [PA]EP1101849 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) [PA] 1 * paragraph [0008]; figure . * |