EP1186570 - Hydrogen-rich gas supply device for fuel cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.10.2005 [2005/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Mitsutaka 2-92-301, Uragou-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120441.9 | 27.08.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | JP20000276342 | 12.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000276342 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186570 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186570 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186570 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/58, H01M8/06, B01J19/00 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
H01M8/0625 (EP,US);
B01J19/0013 (EP,US);
C01B3/323 (EP,US);
C01B3/583 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00063 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00191 (EP,US);
B01J2219/002 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00225 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00231 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0227 (EP,US);
C01B2203/044 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/066 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0811 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1276 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1604 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1619 (EP,US);
C01B2203/169 (EP,US);
H01M8/04097 (EP,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/01] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Versorgung einer Brennstoffzelle mit wasserstoffreichem Gas | [2002/11] | English: | Hydrogen-rich gas supply device for fuel cell | [2002/11] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation d'un gaz riche en hydrogène pour une pile à combustible | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2001 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0941963 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3-5,9,10 * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 33 * * abstract * * figures 1,3 *; | [AD]JPH08133701 ; | [A]EP0955351 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * page 7, line 10 - page 7, line 26 * * page 10, line 23 - page 10, line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0833401 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 17, line 7 - column 17, line 22 * * column 19, line 4 - column 19, line 20 * * column 21, line 8 - column 21, line 43 * * figure 1 *; | [AD]JP2000063104 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08133701 A 19960528 (AQUEOUS RES:KK;AISIN AW CO LTD) [AD] 1,3-5,9,10 * abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000063104 A 20000229 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] * abstract * |