blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1288971

EP1288971 - Method of manufacturing zinc oxide varistor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/10]Zinc oxide varistor and method of manufacturing same
[2012/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2013
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 02.10.2013  [2013/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2003/10]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shiraishi, Kaori
43-9, Takenouchi-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0043 / JP
02 / Inoue, Tatsuya
48-8-402, Noborimachi
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0046 / JP
03 / Sasaki, Riho
2-3-602, Ikaganishimachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0066 / JP
04 / Noi, Keiichi
16, Kutsunugi
Tanabe
Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0331 / JP
05 / Tokunaga, Hideaki
3-19-7-206, Shintomi
Chitose-shi, Hokkaido 066-0037 / JP
 [2012/25]
Former [2003/10]01 / Kaori, Shiraishi
43-9, Takenouchi-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0043 / JP
02 / Tatsuya, Inoue
48-8-402, Noborimachi
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569-0046 / JP
03 / Riho, Sasaki
2-3-602, Ikaganishimachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0066 / JP
04 / Keiichi, Noi
16, Kutsunugi, Tanabe
Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0331 / JP
05 / Hideaki, Tokunaga
3-19-7-206, Shintomi
Chitose-shi, Hokkaido 066-0037 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2003/10]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date01120823.829.08.2001
[2003/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1288971
Date:05.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1288971
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01C7/112
[2003/10]
CPC:
H01C7/112 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/48]
Former [2003/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Zinkoxidvaristors[2012/03]
English:Method of manufacturing zinc oxide varistor[2012/03]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une varistance en oxyde de zinc[2012/03]
Former [2003/10]Zinkoxidvaristor und Verfahren zur Herstellung
Former [2003/10]Zinc oxide varistor and method of manufacturing same
Former [2003/10]Varistance en oxyde de zinc et procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure02.07.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
18.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2008Invitation to provide information on prior art
27.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2008Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
07.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2012Fee for grant paid
09.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.01.2008
Opposition(s)21.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
30.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
30.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR31.08.2012
GB20.09.2012
[2013/40]
Former [2013/34]GB20.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH08124720  ;
 [A]JPH03173402  ;
 [A]EP0866474  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-42* the whole document *;
 [XA]US6260258  (TOKUNAGA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,11,17-25,30-32,36-39,42 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 7 * * column 2, line 24 - line 41 * [A] ,3-6,8,10,12-16,26-29,33-35,40,41
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960930), vol. 1996, no. 09, & JP08124720 A 19960517 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-42 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911024), vol. 015, no. 419, Database accession no. (E - 1126), & JP03173402 A 19910726 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-42 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.