EP1184278 - Motor-assisted bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2007/04] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagomi, Yoshio, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Maruyama, Tomoyuki, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Nagura, Hidenori, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Shimmura, Hiroyuki, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Fukunaga, Makoto, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 06 /
Iseno, Mitsuru, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 07 /
Fukuma, Go, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 08 /
Kashima, Hajime, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2007/03] |
Former [2002/10] | 01 /
Nakagomi, Yoshio, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | ||
02 /
Maruyama, Tomoyuki, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Nagura, Hidenori, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
04 /
Shimmura, Hiroyuki, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
05 /
Fukunaga, Makoto, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
06 /
Iseno, Mitsuru, K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
07 /
Fukuma, Go, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
08 /
Kashima, Hajime, c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Cho 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | Representative(s) | Liska, Horst, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Liska, Horst, Dr.-Ing., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120878.2 | 30.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000263902 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000263902 | JP20000345741 | 13.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000345741 | JP20000317804 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000317804 | JP20000379922 | 14.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000379922 | JP20000350824 | 17.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000350824 | JP20010104323 | 03.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001104323 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184278 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184278 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184278 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62M23/02 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B62M6/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] | Title | German: | Fahrrad mit Hilfsantrieb | [2002/10] | English: | Motor-assisted bicycle | [2002/10] | French: | Bicyclette à assistance motorisée | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 28.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2007 | BE | 24.01.2007 | CY | 24.01.2007 | DK | 24.01.2007 | FI | 24.01.2007 | TR | 24.01.2007 | SE | 24.04.2007 | GR | 25.04.2007 | PT | 25.06.2007 | IE | 30.08.2007 | LU | 30.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
LU | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
CY | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
IE | 30.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
GR | 25.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
BE | 24.01.2007 | ||
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 24.01.2007 | |
DK | 24.01.2007 | ||
FI | 24.01.2007 | ||
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
SE | 24.04.2007 | ||
PT | 25.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 24.01.2007 | |
PT | 25.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10181651 ; | [X]JPH10138981 ; | [X]JPH09126917 ; | [X]JPH10152089 ; | [X]JP2000033893 ; | [X]JPH09301262 ; | [X]JP2000108980 ; | [X]DE2218730 (SOLO KLEINMOTOREN GMBH) [X] 1-3,13 * page 5 * * page 10 - page 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4410060 (CUNARD JOEL C [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0905013 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5934401 (MAYER RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0935128 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1* figures 1-3 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10181651 A 19980707 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,13 * abstract * [A] 17 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10138981 A 19980526 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-5,8,9,11,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09126917 A 19970516 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-3,9,11,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10152089 A 19980609 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8,11,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000033893 A 20000202 (MIYATA IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, & JP09301262 A 19971125 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD; NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000108980 A 20000418 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH06239286 | JPH09142349 | JPH11105758 |