EP1158046 - Superoxide Dismutase-4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES, INC. 9410 Key West Avenue Rockville, MD 20850-3338 / US | [2001/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Guo-Liang 242 Gravatt Drive Berkley, California 94705 / US | 02 /
Rosen, Craig A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, Maryland 20882 / US | 03 /
Fraser, Claire M. 11915 Glenn Mill Road Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | 04 /
Gocayne, Jeanine D. 30 Eldwick Court Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | [2002/29] |
Former [2002/05] | 01 /
Yu, Guo-Liang 242 Gravatt Drive Berkeley, California 94705 / US | ||
02 /
Rosen, Craig A. 22400 Rolling Hill Road Laytonsville, Maryland 20882 / US | |||
03 /
Fraser, Claire M. 11915 Glenn Mill Road Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | |||
04 /
Gocayne, Jeanine D. 30 Eldwick Court Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01120917.8 | 31.05.1994 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | US19940225757 | 11.04.1994 Original published format: US 225757 | [2001/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1158046 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C12N15/53, C12N15/67, A61K38/44 | [2001/48] | CPC: |
C12N9/0089 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/48] | Title | German: | Superoxid Dismutase-4 | [2001/48] | English: | Superoxide Dismutase-4 | [2001/48] | French: | Superoxide Dismutase-4 | [2001/48] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/30] | 05.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94923172.4 / EP0775199 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9207935 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X] - SAKAMOTO A ET AL, "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES OF TWO CDNA CLONES ENCODING DIFFERENT CU/ZN-SUPEROXIDE DISMUTASES EXPRESSED IN DEVELOPING RICE SEED (ORYZA SATIVA L.)", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, NIJHOFF PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (1992), vol. 19, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 323 - 327, XP002041045 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00027355 | [X] - HONG, Z. ET A., "Schistosoma mansoni: cloning of a complementary DNA encoding a cytosolic Cu/Zn superoxide dismutase and high-yield expression of the enzymatically active gene product in Escherichia coli.", EXP. PARASIT., (1992), vol. 75, pages 308 - 322, XP001018582 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4894(92)90216-W | [X] - CHURCH S L, "MANGANESE SUPEROXIDE DISMUTASE: NUCLEOTIDE AND DEDUCED AMINO ACID SEQUENCE OF A CDNA ENCODING A NEW HUMAN TRANSCRIPT", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. GENE STRUCTURE AND EXPRESSION, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1990), vol. 1087, ISSN 0167-4781, pages 250 - 252, XP002041044 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4781(90)90213-L |