EP1288860 - Method for processing digital photographic image data including a method for the automatic detection of red-eye defects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AgfaPhoto GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2005/10] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meckes, Günter Heilmaierstrasse 38 81447 München / DE | 02 /
Damm, Tobias Karolingerallee 10 81545 München / DE | 03 /
Fürsich, Manfred Hainbuchenstrasse 53 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | 04 /
Oberhardt, Knut Eichenweg 2 83607 Föching / DE | 05 /
Hartmann, Klaus Beerengarten 12 86938 Schondorf / DE | 06 /
Schuhrke, Thomas Alzstrasse 17 81549 München / DE | 07 /
Taresch, Gudrun Thalkirchner Strasse 66 80337 München / DE | [2003/10] | Application number, filing date | 01121103.4 | 03.09.2001 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288860 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/624 (EP,US);
G06V40/193 (EP,US);
G06T5/77 (EP,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30216 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung digitaler fotografischer Bilddaten, welches ein Verfahren zum automatischen Erkennen von rote-Augen-Defekten umfasst | [2003/10] | English: | Method for processing digital photographic image data including a method for the automatic detection of red-eye defects | [2003/10] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de données d'image photographique digitales comprenant une méthode automatique de détection de défauts type yeux-rouge | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M03   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.01.2006 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2006/17] | 01.04.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2009/45] | 01.01.2006 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0635972 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - line 56 * * page 3, line 45 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 23 - line 34 * * page 7, line 1 - line 5 *; | [A]US6038339 (HUBEL PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 1-3,13-15 * abstract ** column 9, line 22 - line 36 * |