EP1199210 - Control device for plurality of rotating electrical machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2011/21] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arimitsu, Minoru 219, Wingfort, 1-6-5, Heisei-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Masaki 2140-41, Kamiiida-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber & Partner Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121106.7 | 03.09.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000315735 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000315735 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199210 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199210 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199210 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, B60L15/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B60L15/025 (EP,US);
B60L50/60 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L2220/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/31] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Regelvorrichtung für eine Mehrzahl von elektrischen Maschinen | [2002/17] | English: | Control device for plurality of rotating electrical machines | [2002/17] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour une pluralité de machines électriques | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 26.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11341887 ; | [Y]US5460244 (TANAHASHI TORU [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0698769 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 4 *; | [Y]US5625262 (LAPOTA ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11341887 A 19991210 (EKUSEN KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |