EP1184603 - Variable speed control apparatus for automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states BANDO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-15, Meiwadori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyata, Hirofumi, Bando Chemical Industries, Ltd. 2-15, Meiwa-dori 3-chome, Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-0883 / JP | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zinnecker, Armin, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/10] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121165.3 | 04.09.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | JP20000266673 | 04.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000266673 | [2002/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184603 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184603 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00, F16H9/18 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
F16H63/067 (EP,US);
F16H9/04 (KR);
F16H61/66254 (EP,US);
F16H2061/6616 (EP,US);
F16H61/66272 (EP,US);
F16H63/062 (EP,US);
F16H7/1281 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/10] | F16H61/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für stufenlose Geschwindigkeitsregelung in Kraftfahrzeugen | [2002/10] | English: | Variable speed control apparatus for automotive vehicles | [2002/10] | French: | Dispositif de commande de variation de vitesse continue pour véhicules automobiles | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.10.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0681119 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 9, line 21 - column 11, line 34 * * column 19, line 21 - column 21, line 47; figures 1-6,12-15 *; | [DY]JPH11336863 ; | [Y]JPH05149400 ; | [A]DE19828039 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]AT402495B (RIEDL GERHARD ING [AT]) [A] 3 * page 3, line 8 - line 15 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0952078 (ALPHA TECHNIK MEIER & HOFMANN [DE]) [A] 3 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0383282 (BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000330), vol. 2000, no. 03, & JP11336863 A 19991207 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [DY] 1-4 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931004), vol. 017, no. 548, Database accession no. (M - 1490), & JP05149400 A 19930615 (KUBOTA CORP) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH11336863 |