EP1186806 - Control apparatus for an automotive continuously variable transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanda, Tomoyuki c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Kotegawa, Tamotsu c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Tsubata, Yoshimichi c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd., 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121292.5 | 05.09.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | JP20000268970 | 05.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000268970 | [2002/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186806 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186806 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186806 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/00 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
F16H61/66272 (EP,US);
F16H61/66259 (EP,US);
F16H2061/6611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/16] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung für stufenloses Getriebe in einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2002/11] | English: | Control apparatus for an automotive continuously variable transmission | [2002/11] | French: | Dispositif de commande de transmission à variation continue véhiculaire | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 20.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0762018 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5188007 (HATTORI YUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 5 - line 45 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JPH03229052 ; | [A]JPH02159451 ; | [A]DE19612870 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920107), vol. 016, no. 002, Database accession no. (M - 1197), & JP03229052 A 19911011 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900905), vol. 014, no. 410, Database accession no. (M - 1020), & JP02159451 A 19900619 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09303550 |