EP1186508 - Vehicle with a shock energie absorbing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/11] | Shock energy absorbing device for vehicles | ||
[2006/05] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | [2003/44] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Rail Systems GmbH Saatwinkler Damm 43 13627 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Lothar Christ Strasse 8A 14059 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Marggraf, Matthias Regattastrasse 64 12527 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Carstensen, Hartmut Bernauer Strasse 133d 13507 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Hoppe, Kerstin Spandauer Landstrasse 97 16761 Hennigsdorf / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121535.7 | 10.09.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE20001045780 | 11.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045780 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186508 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186508 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186508 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B61G11/00, B61D15/06 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
B61D15/06 (EP);
B61G11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/11] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit einer Stoßenergie-Verzehreinrichtung | [2006/05] | English: | Vehicle with a shock energie absorbing device | [2006/05] | French: | Vèhicule muni d'un dispositif pour l'absorption d'énergie de choc | [2006/05] |
Former [2002/11] | Stossenergie-Verzehrvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge | ||
Former [2002/11] | Shock energy absorbing device for vehicles | ||
Former [2002/11] | Dispositif pour l'absorption d'énergie de choc pour véhicules | Examination procedure | 03.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG Gottfried-Linke-Strasse 205 38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE Opponent's representative Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.2007
ADMISSIBLE Voith Turbo Scharfenberg GmbH & Co. KG Gottfried-Linke-Strasse 205 38239 Salzgitter-Watenstedt / DE Opponent's representative Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 48 80538 München / DE | 08.02.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.08.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/29] | 01.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | LU | 10.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | [2011/38] |
Former [2009/42] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
TR | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 10.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/37] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 10.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE422907 (CARL LANG) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1893634 (SOLOMON PFEFFER) [A] 1 * page 1, line 52 - page 2, line 44; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4226731 (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH [DE]) [A] 1* column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 60; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]DE19546729 (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 18; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,7,8 | by applicant | DE19705226 |