EP1189007 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pasqualini, Piero Via Monviso, 8 20010 Marcallo Con Casone-Milano / IT | [2002/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli S.r.l. Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Petruzziello, Aldo, et al Racheli & C. S p A Viale San Michele del Carso, 4 20144 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01121546.4 | 10.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI02039 | 19.09.2000 Original published format: IT MI002039 | [2002/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189007 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189007 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189007 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/10 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
F25B39/02 (EP);
F25B39/04 (EP);
F28B1/06 (EP);
F28D5/02 (EP);
F28D7/0066 (EP);
F28D7/0083 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2002/12] | English: | Heat exchanger | [2002/12] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.02.2007 | SE | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2008/19] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 02.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61285389 ; | [A]GB1056075 (ESCHER WYSS AG) [A] 3 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0031919 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-11 * page 5, lines 19-39 * * page 7, lines 34-36 * * page 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4284133 (GIANNI SEBASTIAN J, et al) [A] 3 * column 1, lines 8-19; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]US4326582 (ROSMAN IRWIN E, et al) [Y] 7-10 * column 3, lines 28-44; figures 2-4 * [A] 3; | [A]GB2129110 (HUETOETECHNIKA IPARI SZOEVETKE) [A] 11-19 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9012992 (MAEKINEN KALERVO PAEIVIOE [FI]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10; | [X]EP0437768 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,11 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 44; figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5377500 (YANG TEN S [TW]) [A] 11-19 * page 2, lines 15-29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5735342 (NITTA MINORU [US]) [A] 9,10,12 * abstract ** column 1, lines 44-46 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870520), vol. 0111, no. 55, Database accession no. (M - 589), & JP61285389 A 19861216 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-4,7,8 * abstract * |