EP1188976 - Flexible tube, and method for manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-machi Kita-ku Saitama Saitama / JP | [2006/01] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Fujinon Corporation 1-324 Uetake-machi Kita-ku Saitama Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd. 324, Uetake-machi 1-chome Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamata, Kouichi Junnes Nomoto 202, 2-17-8, Shimmei Okegawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Akiba, Haruo 48-4, Midori-cho, Koga-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Kimura, Masanori 3-32-30, Higashi-mamada, Oyama-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | 04 /
Muraki, Kouichi Aoba Dormitory 301 1144, Higashi-ushigaya Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2005/31] |
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
Kamata, Kouichi Junnes Nomoto 202, 2-17-8, Shimmei Okegawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Akiba, Haruo 48-4, Modori-cho, Koga-shi Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Kimura, Masanori 3-32-30, Higashi-mamada, Oyama-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Muraki, Kouichi Aoba Dormitory 301 1144, Higashi-ushigaya Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121662.9 | 13.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000278310 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000278310 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1188976 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1188976 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | [2002/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1188976 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/018, F16L11/10, B29D23/00, // B29L23:00, B29L9:00 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
B29D23/001 (EP,US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
F16L11/085 (EP,US);
B29C2793/009 (EP,US);
B29C48/001 (EP,US);
B29C48/0021 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/151 (EP,US);
B29C48/21 (EP,US);
B29C53/385 (EP,US);
B29C53/50 (EP,US);
B29C53/562 (EP,US);
B29C53/68 (EP,US);
B29C61/006 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2027/12 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0836 (EP,US);
B29K2305/00 (EP,US);
B29K2705/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0049 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0067 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0073 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | F16L11/10, B29D23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/11] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schlauch und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2002/12] | English: | Flexible tube, and method for manufacturing same | [2002/12] | French: | Tube souple et son procédé de fabrication | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH04341836 ; | [DA]JPH0595892 ; | [A]US3915618 (FEUCHT ROBERT H, et al) [A] 1-3,8 * column 1, line 8 - line 15; figures 2,12,30 * * column 4, line 48 - column 6, line 38 * * column 8, line 8 - line 32 * * column 13, line 51 - line 55 *; | [A]WO9505555 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1-3,8 * figure 10; examples 4,5 *; | [A]US5789047 (SASAKI FUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 13 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930416), vol. 017, no. 196, Database accession no. (M - 1397), & JP04341836 A 19921127 (FUJI PHOTO OPTICAL CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930810), vol. 017, no. 429, Database accession no. (C - 1095), & JP05095892 A 19930420 (JUNKOSHA CO LTD) [DA] 1-8 * abstract * |