EP1193299 - Use of branched polymers as levelling agent in formulations for surface coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/14] | Leveling agent for surface coating | ||
[2006/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYK-Chemie GmbH Abelstrasse 45 46483 Wesel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Byk-Chemie GmbH Abelstrasse 45 46483 Wesel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haubennestel, Karlheinz Hermann-Hesse Strasse 30 46487 Wesel / DE | 02 /
Bubat, Alfred Gotenstrasse 19 46487 Wesel-Bislich / DE | 03 /
Frank, Albert Pärdendyckweg 47 46509 Xanten / DE | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
Haubennestel, Karlheinz Hermann-Hesse Strasse 30 46487 Wesel / DE | ||
02 /
Bubat, Alfred Gotenstrasse 19 46487 Wesel-Bislich / DE | |||
03 /
Frank, Alfred Pärdendyckweg 47 46509 Xanten / DE | Representative(s) | Leifert, Elmar Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Leifert, Elmar, Dr. Leifert & Steffan Burgplatz 21-22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121700.7 | 17.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | DE20001048258 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10048258 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193299 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193299 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | [2003/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193299 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D7/06, C08F290/04, C08F290/06 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
C08F290/04 (EP,US);
C08F283/12 (EP,US);
C08F290/06 (EP,US);
C08F290/061 (EP,US);
C08F290/068 (EP,US);
C09D7/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | Verwendung verzweigter Polymere als Verlaufmittel für Beschichtungsmittelformulierungen zur Oberflächenbeschichtungen | [2006/14] | English: | Use of branched polymers as levelling agent in formulations for surface coating | [2006/14] | French: | Utilisation de polymères branchés comme agent d'écoulement pour revêtement de surface | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/14] | Verlaufmittel für Oberflächenbeschichtungen | ||
Former [2002/14] | Leveling agent for surface coating | ||
Former [2002/14] | Agent d'écoulement pour revêtements de surface | Examination procedure | 31.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IE | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | LU | 17.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | ES | 27.11.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
TR | 16.08.2006 | ||
LU | 17.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
IE | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 16.08.2006 | |
SE | 16.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4812364 (ALBERTS HEINRICH [DE], et al) [A] 18 * claims 9,10 *; | [A]WO9502016 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 18* abstract *; | [DX]EP0732346 (KYOEISHA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1-6,8-10,12-18 * page 1, lines 14-21; example 1; claims 1,2 * * page 4, lines 5-8 *; | [X]EP0735066 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, lines 28-21; examples REF,1-7; claims 1-4 *; | [X]EP0783023 (LEXMARK INT INC [US]) [X] 1-10,12-18 * page 8, lines 25-30; claims 1-8,13 *; | [DX]US5770646 (ANTONELLI JOSEPH ALBERT [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,8,9,11-13 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 5; examples 1,4; claims 1-8 *; | [X]DE19707786 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * claim -; table 1 *; | [X]EP1006165 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]) [X] 11-14 * examples REF,3,4; claims 11-14 * |