EP1191287 - Pipe system for thermal energy exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB Aktiengesellschaft Johann-Klein-Strasse 9 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Illy, Alois Heidelberger Strasse 5 67117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Kracht, Petra Kranichstrasse 9 67069 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Gröning, Norbert Platanenstrasse 8 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 04 /
Hanewald, Dieter Eppsteinerstrasse 21 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 05 /
Flak, Stefan Speyerer Strasse 20 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2002/13] | Application number, filing date | 01121721.3 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000146862 | 20.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10046862 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191287 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191287 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191287 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
F24D19/1012 (EP);
F24D19/1033 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] | Title | German: | Leitungssystem zur thermischen Energieübertragung | [2002/13] | English: | Pipe system for thermal energy exchange | [2002/13] | French: | Système de tuyauterie pour l'échange d'énergie thermique | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.05.2007 | FI | 09.05.2007 | IE | 09.05.2007 | TR | 09.05.2007 | SE | 09.08.2007 | GR | 10.08.2007 | ES | 20.08.2007 | LU | 18.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | PT | 09.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
LU | 18.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 09.05.2007 | |
FI | 09.05.2007 | ||
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
GR | 10.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
IE | 09.05.2007 | ||
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
PT | 09.10.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 09.05.2007 | |
SE | 09.08.2007 | ||
ES | 20.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 20.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3203832 (CENTRA BUERKLE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 13, line 27 - page 20, line 17; figures 2,4 * [A] 6-21; | [XA]DE3502873 (LANDIS & GYR AG [CH]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 32 - page 9, line 4; figure 1 * [A] 17; | [XA]EP0308806 (KNOLL ALOIS L [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 12, line 50 - page 14, line 2; figure 10 * [A] 17; | [X]EP0624760 (LACHENMEIER GEORG [CH]) [X] 1,2* the whole document *; | [X]DE4446974 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0282886 | DE4312150 |