EP1189489 - Control circuit with configuration intput [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TridonicAtco GmbH & Co. KG Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | [2002/18] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states Tridonic Bauelemente GmbH Färbergasse 15 6851 Dornbirn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zudrell-Koch, Stefan Rohrmoos 60 6850 Dornbirn / AT | 02 /
Knödgen, Horst Hitlstrasse 64 80997 München / DE | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Rupp, Christian, Dipl.-Phys., et al Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Schmidt-Evers, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122010.0 | 13.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | DE2000145713 | 15.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10045713 | DE2001128587 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10128587 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1189489 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189489 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/36, H05B41/38 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H05B41/38 (EP);
H05B41/282 (EP);
H05B41/36 (EP);
Y02B20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung mit Konfigurierungseingang | [2002/12] | English: | Control circuit with configuration intput | [2002/12] | French: | Circuit de commande avec une entrée de configuration | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 31.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | IE | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | LU | 13.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
TR | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
LU | 13.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
IT | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5187414 (FELLOWS MARK W [US], et al) [A] 5-13 * abstract * * column 4 * * column 6, line 1 - column 9, line 8 *; | [A]WO9818296 (LOGICAL TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - page 3, line 10 *; | [A]WO9839949 (TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE [AT], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0024230 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-13; | [PA]EP1041862 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [PA] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0025] , [0029] , [0064] , [0065] , [0078] *; | [A] - UNITRODE, linear integrated circuits data and applications handbook, USA, UNITRODE INTEGRATED CIRCUITS CORP, (1990), XP002172830 [A] 2-4 * pages 5-64 * |