EP1189396 - A system and method of reducing retransmission of messages in a TCP/IP environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroon, Jeffrey 4333 Wells Curtice Rd. Canandaigua, NY 14424 / US | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122033.2 | 13.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | US20000661402 | 13.09.2000 Original published format: US 661402 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189396 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189396 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04L12/58 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H04L47/193 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/24 (EP,US);
H04L47/27 (EP,US);
H04L47/286 (EP,US);
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/163 (EP,US);
H04L69/168 (EP,US);
H04W28/10 (EP);
H04W8/04 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Reduzierung der Wiederübertragung von Nachrichten in TCP/IP-Umgebung | [2002/12] | English: | A system and method of reducing retransmission of messages in a TCP/IP environment | [2002/12] | French: | Système et procédé pour réduir la retransmission des messages dans le milieu TCP/IP | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2003 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 25.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9417606 (DIGITAL OCEAN INC [US]) [Y] 4 * page 14, line 15 - page 16, line 31; figure 1 *; | [X]US6018516 (PACKER ROBERT L [US]) [X] 7,8 * column 1, lines 37-40; figures 2A,2B * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 6 ** column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 7 *; | [XY] - BALAKRISHNAN H ET AL, "Improving TCP/IP performance over wireless networks", MOBICOM'95. PROCEEDINGS OF THE FIRST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING, PROCEEDINGS OF ACM INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MOBILE COMPUTING AND NETWORKING 1995, BERKELEY, CA, USA, 13-15 NOV. 1995, 1995, New York, NY, USA, ACM, USA, ISBN 0-89791-814-2, pages 1 - 10, XP002243766 [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * page 4, column L, line 45 - page 4, column R, line 6; figure 2 * * page 3, column L, line 41 - page 3, column R, line 3 * [Y] 4 | [X] - BYUNG-GON CHUN ET AL, "Auxiliary timeout and selective packet discard schemes to improve TCP performance in PCN environment", COMMUNICATIONS, 1997. ICC '97 MONTREAL, TOWARDS THE KNOWLEDGE MILLENNIUM. 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUE., CANADA 8-12 JUNE 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970608), ISBN 0-7803-3925-8, pages 381 - 385, XP010227150 [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * page 383, column L, line 33 - page 383, column R, line 50; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1997.605305 | Examination | WO0052884 |