EP1293727 - Control apparatus for a burner and a method for adjustment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Schweiz AG Albisriederstrasse 245 8047 Zürich / CH | [2005/45] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Bellerivestrasse 36 8008 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lochschmied, Rainer, Dr. Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 46a 76287 Rheinstetten / DE | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Weise, Wolfgang Siemens Schweiz AG Intellectual Property Department Zug Gubelstrasse 22 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Weise, Wolfgang Siemens Schweiz AG Intellectual Property Department Zug Gubelstrasse 22 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2003/12] | Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122047.2 | 13.09.2001 | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293727 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293727 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/02, F23N5/12, G05B23/02 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
F23N1/022 (EP,US);
F23N5/123 (EP,US);
G05B13/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Regeleinrichtung für einen Brenner und Einstellverfahren | [2003/12] | English: | Control apparatus for a burner and a method for adjustment | [2003/12] | French: | Appareil de commande d'un brûleur et méthode de réglage | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.11.2005 | FI | 23.11.2005 | IE | 23.11.2005 | GR | 23.02.2006 | PT | 24.04.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/45] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
IT | 23.11.2005 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
PT | 24.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
IE | 23.11.2005 | ||
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 23.11.2005 | |
GR | 23.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 23.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAY]DE4429157 (KROMSCHROEDER AG G [DE]) [XD] 7,8 * Zusammenfassung; column 1, line 56 - column 4, line 24; figure 2; claim 1 * [A] 1-6 [Y] 9,10; | [YDA]EP0770824 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 9 * Das ganze Dokument * [A] 1-8; | [YDA]DE19854824 (STIEBEL ELTRON GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [YD] 10 * column 3, line 23 - column 3, line 25; figure 1 * * column 2, line 44 - line 45 * [A] 1-9; | [A]DE10003819 (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) [A] 1-10* Das ganze Dokument * |