Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6791778 | 14.09.2004 | B2 | US2002048108 | 25.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23265000 | 14.09.2000 | US95268201 | 13.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100416604B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2004 | B1 | KR20020021358 | 20.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US23265000 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002150719 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US23265000 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1189222 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2009 | B1 | EP1189222 | 11.06.2003 | A3 | EP1189222 | 20.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23265000 | 14.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60139057D1 | 06.08.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US23265000 | 14.09.2000 |