EP1189222 - Method and apparatus to detect and manage servo sectors with defects on servo pattern area in hard disk drives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Sang-Hoon 1519-19, Shinrim 9-dong, Gwanak-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Shim, Jun-Seok 22330 Homestead Road, No. 108 Cupertino, California 95104 / US | 03 /
Yu, Seong-Hwan 75 West Plumeria Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | 04 /
Choi, Soo-il D105-601, Hanyang APT Gugal-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/32] | 01 /
Chu, Sang-Hoon 1519-19, Shinrim 9-dong Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Shim, Jun-Seok 22330 Homestead Road, No. 108 Cupertino, California 95104 / US | |||
03 /
Yu, Seong-Hwan 75 West Plumeria Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
04 /
Choi, Soo-Il D105-601, Hanyang APT Gugal-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2002/22] | 01 /
Chu, Sang-Hoon 1519-19, Shinrim 9-dong Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Shim, Jun-Seok 22330 Homestead Road, No. 108 Cupertino, California 95104 / US | |||
03 /
Yu, Seong-Hwan 75 West Plumeria Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
04 /
Choi, Soo-Il #105-601, Hanyang APT Gugal-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2002/12] | 01 /
Chu, Sang-Hoon 900 Pepper Tree Lane, No. 1012 Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | ||
02 /
Shim, Jun-Seok 22330 Homestead Road, No. 108 Cupertino, California 95104 / US | |||
03 /
Yu, Seong-Hwan 75 West Plumeria Drive San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
04 /
Choi, Soo-Il 1535 Bella Vista Club, No. 2206 Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122138.9 | 14.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | US20000232650P | 14.09.2000 Original published format: US 232650 P | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189222 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189222 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189222 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/18, G11B5/596, G11B27/36 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B21/02 (KR);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US);
G11B5/59655 (EP,US);
G11B2020/183 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/12] | G11B19/04, G11B5/596 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/10] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erkennen und zur Handhabung von Servosektoren mit Fehlern im Servostrukturbereich von Festplatten | [2002/12] | English: | Method and apparatus to detect and manage servo sectors with defects on servo pattern area in hard disk drives | [2002/12] | French: | Procédé et apparail de détection et de gestion des secteurs d'asservissement avec des défauts dans la surface des motives d'asservissement | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1145524 ; | [A]US5710677 (TENG JACK MING [SG], et al) [A] 1-26* the whole document *; | [X]US5870243 (UKANI ANISH A [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 3, line 58 - column 7, line 5; figures 1-5 * * column 7, line 63 - column 9, line 31; figure 8 *; | [A]US5875066 (OTTESEN HAL HJALMAR [US]) [A] 1-26 * column 1, line 23 - column 7, line 65; figures 1-2B *; | [A]US6005739 (YUN JONG-YUN [KR]) [A] 1-26 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 39; figures 1,4,5 *; | US2001036032 [ ] (FUKUSHIMA YUKIO [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] - [0045] - [0068]; figures 1-8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11045524 A 19990216 (INTERNATL BUSINESS MACH CORP |