EP1193095 - Windscreen device for open vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bogisch, Axel Meisenweg 23 71120 Grafenau / DE | 02 /
Fölster, Thomas, Dr. Lindenweg 11 71120 Grafenau / DE | 03 /
Orizaris, Vasilios Am Pfarrtor 5 71272 Renningen / DE | 04 /
Pfahler, Karl, Dr. Mühlrain 22 70180 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Schrader, Jürgen Mühlweg 7 71093 Weil im Schönbuch / DE | [2002/14] | Application number, filing date | 01122282.5 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | DE2000147754 | 27.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10047754 | [2002/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193095 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193095 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193095 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1193095 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/22, B60N2/56, B60H1/24 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
B60N2/5635 (EP,US);
B60J7/223 (EP,US);
B60N2/5657 (EP,US);
B60N2/5671 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/14] | B60J7/22, B60N2/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/03] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Windschutzeinrichtung für einen offenen Kraftwagen | [2002/14] | English: | Windscreen device for open vehicle | [2002/14] | French: | Dispositif de pare-vent pour véhicule ouvert | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 05.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.2005
08.08.2005
ADMISSIBLE PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR Opponent's representative Fernandez, Francis Lionel PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.07.2005
PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR Opponent's representative Fernandez, Francis Lionel PSA PEUGEOT CITROEN Service Brevets (081) 18 Rue de Fauvelles 92250 LA GARENNE COLOMBES / FR | 09.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.07.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.12.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.05.2007 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.11.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2630056 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-3,6* figures 1-4; claims 1-4 *; | [DA]DE9201474U (ORIS-METALLBAU KG HANS RIEHLE) [DA] 1 * figures 1-4; claims 1-3,7 *; | [A]US5137326 (GEORGE ALBERT R [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 2; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE19908497 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,7,8 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3,12 * | by applicant | DE9201474U | Opposition | JPH04158807 | DE19654370 | FR2782953 | DE19846090 |