EP1189245 - Magnetic alloy powder for permanent magnet and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neomax Co., Ltd. 7-19 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2006/07] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Neomax Co., Ltd. 4-7-19 Kitahama, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states SUMITOMO SPECIAL METALS COMPANY LIMITED 7-19, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomizawa, Hiroyuki 7-62-408, Ikagakitamachi Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0036 / JP | 02 /
Kaneko, Yuji 39-207, Kohata Okurayama Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0002 / JP | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122304.7 | 18.09.2001 | [2002/12] | Priority number, date | JP20000282412 | 18.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000282412 | [2002/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1189245 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1189245 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1189245 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/057, H01F1/058 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
H01F1/0574 (EP,US);
H01F1/058 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/12] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Legierungspulver für Dauermagnet und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2002/12] | English: | Magnetic alloy powder for permanent magnet and method for producing the same | [2002/12] | French: | Poudre en alliage magnétique pour aimant permanent et procédé de fabrication | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 01.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | BE | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | FR | 15.02.2006 | IT | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | TR | 15.02.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | GB | 18.09.2006 | IE | 18.09.2006 | LU | 18.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
TR | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
GB | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
LU | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
GB | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
GB | 18.09.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 18.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 26.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0542529 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS [JP]) [A] 1-5,8-10,13 * claims 1-4,6,13-15 ** example 3 *; | [A]US5225004 (O'HANDLEY ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8-13 * claim 1 * * column 11, line 19 - line 21 * * figures 1,6,9 *; | [XA]WO0045397 (MAGNEQUENCH INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,13 * claims 1-5,8-10,15-17,19-21 * * page 4, line 21 - line 23 * * page 6, line 3 - line 5 * * figure 1 * [A] 4 |