11.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
27.12.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
18.01.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.02.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
01.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
24.08.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.04.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
12.01.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
15.11.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
18.10.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
22.02.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |