EP1206128 - Method for equalising technologically caused inhomogeneities in single image pickup detector elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cassidian Optronics GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Optronics GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | For all designated states Zeiss Optronik GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiedmann, Wolfgang Rechbergweg 4 73457 Essingen / DE | [2002/20] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2012/44] | Gnatzig, Klaus Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2002/20] | Gnatzig, Klaus Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122502.6 | 20.09.2001 | [2002/20] | Priority number, date | DE2000155862 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055862 | [2002/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1206128 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1206128 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1206128 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/365, H04N5/33 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
H04N25/671 (EP);
G06T5/94 (EP);
H04N25/672 (EP);
H04N25/76 (EP);
G06T2207/10048 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/20] | H04N5/217, H04N5/33 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/06] |
Former [2002/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausgleich von technologisch bedingten Inhomogenitäten in einzelnen Bildaufnahmedetektorelementen | [2002/20] | English: | Method for equalising technologically caused inhomogeneities in single image pickup detector elements | [2002/20] | French: | Procédé d'égalisation des inhomogénéitiés technologiques dans des éléments individuels d'un détecteur de prise de vues | [2002/20] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.06.2012 | 14.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4975864 (SENDALL ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5631466 (BOTTI DOMINIC J [US], et al); | [AD]EP0873011 (AEG INFRAROT MODULE GMBH [DE]) |