EP1199094 - Dust filter bag with highly porous support layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neenah Gessner GmbH Otto-von-Steinbeis-Str. 14b 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states FiberMark Gessner GmbH & Co. Otto-von-Steinbeis-Strasse 14b 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emig, Dietmar Am Forellensteg 4 83229 Aschau i. Ch. / DE | 02 /
Raabe, Ernst Panger Strasse 17A 83064 Raubling / DE | 03 /
Klimmek, Albrecht Friedrich-Jahn-Strasse 7 1/2 83052 Bruckmühl / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122677.6 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | DE2000151186 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: DE 10051186 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199094 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199094 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1199094 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16, A47L9/14 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
A47L9/14 (EP,US);
B01D39/163 (EP,US);
B01D39/18 (EP,US);
B01D39/2024 (EP,US);
Y10S55/02 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US);
Y10S55/19 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Title | German: | Staubfilterbeutel mit hochporöser Trägermateriallage | [2002/17] | English: | Dust filter bag with highly porous support layer | [2002/17] | French: | Sac filtrant à poussière avec couche support à porosité élevée | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 07.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
25.07.2009
WITHDRAWN Airflo Europe N.V. Gaston Eyskenslaan 2, Postbus 56 3900 Overpelt / BE Opponent's representative Dantz, Jan Henning, et al, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
25.07.2009
WITHDRAWN Airflo Europe N.V. Gaston Eyskenslaan 2, Postbus 56 3900 Overpelt / BE Opponent's representative Dantz, Jan Henning, et al, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
29.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Airflo Europe N.V. Gaston Eyskenslaan 2, Postbus 56 3900 Overpelt / BE Opponent's representative Dantz, Jan Henning, et al, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
29.05.2006
ADMISSIBLE Airflo Europe N.V. Gaston Eyskenslaan 2, Postbus 56 3900 Overpelt / BE Opponent's representative Dantz, Jan Henning, et al, et al Loesenbeck Stracke Specht Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2006/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2006
Airflo Europe N.V. Gaston Eyskenslaan 2, Postbus 56 3900 Overpelt / BE Opponent's representative Weigelt, Udo, et al, et al Grünecker, Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | 02.02.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.09.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.09.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.11.2009 | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.06.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.03.2006 | FI | 29.03.2006 | GB | 29.03.2006 | IE | 29.03.2006 | IT | 29.03.2006 | NL | 29.03.2006 | TR | 29.03.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | GR | 30.06.2006 | ES | 10.07.2006 | PT | 29.08.2006 | AT | 28.09.2006 | LU | 28.09.2006 | CH | 30.09.2006 | LI | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 29.03.2006 | |
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
LU | 28.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 29.03.2006 | |
GB | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 28.09.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.09.2006 | ||
LI | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | GB | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | DK | 29.06.2006 | |
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | ES | 10.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [D]EP0635297 (GESSNER & CO GMBH [DE]); | [A]US5437910 (RAABE ERNST [DE], et al); | [AD]DE29907699U (FIBERMARK GESSNER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]EP0960645 (AIRFLO EUROPE NV [BE]) | by applicant | US5167765 | EP0635297 | DE3812849 | WO9730772 | DE29907699U | EP0960645 |