EP1191269 - Tolerance-compensating disconnectable and non-disconnectable pipe connections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Abgastechnik GmbH Herboldshofer Strasse 35 90765 Fürth / DE | [2002/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Binöder, Harald Ansbacher Strasse 19 91459 Markt Erlbach / DE | [2002/13] | Representative(s) | Mörtel & Höfner Patentanwälte Äussere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [2007/34] |
Former [2002/13] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122714.7 | 21.09.2001 | [2002/13] | Priority number, date | DE2000147577 | 22.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10047577 | [2002/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1191269 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1191269 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1191269 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/04 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
F16L27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/50] |
Former [2002/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Toleranzausgleichende lösbare und nicht lösbare Rohrverbindungen | [2002/13] | English: | Tolerance-compensating disconnectable and non-disconnectable pipe connections | [2002/13] | French: | Dispositif de raccords de tuyaux démontable et indémontable avec compensation des tolérances | [2002/13] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 20.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 10.01.2007 | IT | 10.01.2007 | ES | 21.04.2007 | FR | 01.10.2007 | [2008/49] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 10.01.2007 | |
IT | 10.01.2007 | ||
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | GB | 10.01.2007 | |
ES | 21.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | ES | 21.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR853931 (BARBERIS & NEVEUX S A ETS) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 13; figure 2 *; | [A]GB530965 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD) [A] 1-5,7,8,11,12* page 1, line 44 - line 104; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4132437 (GREEN TERRENCE A) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 3, line 21 - line 57; figures 4,6 * * column 5, line 37 - column 6, line 2 *; | [XY]FR2468825 (POLVA NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 30; figures 2,6-9 * [Y] 10-12; | [XY]US5460416 (FREIDRICH RALPH S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * column 9, line 13 - column 13, line 30; figure 4 * [Y] 10-12; | [X]DE29615009U (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,12 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 9; figures 1,4-6,12-14 * |