EP1193125 - Apparatus and method for automatically adjusting optical axis of vehicle headlights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horii, Yasutoshi, c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Okuchi, Hiroaki, c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Masanori, c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | 04 /
Nishimura, Kenichi, c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01122874.9 | 24.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000296880 | 28.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000296880 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193125 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193125 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193125 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/12 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
B60Q1/12 (EP,US);
B60Q1/16 (EP,US);
B60Q1/18 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/122 (EP,US);
B60Q2300/322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/39] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur automatischen Steuerung der Richtung der optischen Achse eines Kfz-Scheinwerfers | [2002/14] | English: | Apparatus and method for automatically adjusting optical axis of vehicle headlights | [2002/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour commander automatiquement l'axe optique d'un phare de véhicule | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5588733 (GOTOU SHINICHIROU [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * column 1, lines 26-29 * * column 2, lines 19-31 * * column 3, lines 58-67 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 44 * * column 7, lines 5-43 * * figures 1-4,8,9 *; | [Y]EP0761497 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * column 5, lines 2,3 * * column 9, line 46 - column 11, line 58 * * column 14, line 43 - column 16, line 47 * * figures 4,14,15,20-23,25 * |