EP1193077 - Recording medium and image forming method utilizing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asaoka, Masanobu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Onuma, Kenji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Misuda, Katsutoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/15] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123046.3 | 26.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000294633 | 27.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000294633 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193077 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193077 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193077 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B41M5/506 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/14] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsmedium und Bilderzeugungsverfahren damit | [2002/14] | English: | Recording medium and image forming method utilizing the same | [2002/14] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement et méthode de formation d'image à partir de celui-ci | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 20.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2005 | BE | 13.04.2005 | FI | 13.04.2005 | TR | 13.04.2005 | DK | 13.07.2005 | GR | 13.07.2005 | SE | 13.07.2005 | ES | 24.07.2005 | PT | 13.09.2005 | CY | 26.09.2005 | IE | 26.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
TR | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
IE | 26.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
GR | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
ES | 24.07.2005 | ||
PT | 13.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.04.2005 | |
BE | 13.04.2005 | ||
FI | 13.04.2005 | ||
DK | 13.07.2005 | ||
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 13.04.2005 | |
SE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 13.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2000127613 ; | [Y]EP0331125 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, line 17 - line 18 * * page 4, line 44 - line 45 * * page 5, line 55 - page 6, line 2 * * page 6, line 55 - page 7, line 14 * * examples 9-12 *; | [A]EP0524626 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 6 - line 36 *; | [A]EP0858907 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-7 * claim 5 ** example - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000127613 A 20000509 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * |