EP1167042 - Ink jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawakami, Kazuhisa Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Otsuka, Nobutoshi Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Mochizuki, Seiji Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 04 /
Sasai, Yoji Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 05 /
Kobayashi, Atsushi Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 06 /
Takeda, Kazuhisa Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 07 /
Isono, Masahiro Seiko Epson Corp., 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123069.5 | 24.11.1997 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP19960327836 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: JP 32783696 | JP19960327837 | 22.11.1996 Original published format: JP 32783796 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167042 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167042 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
B41J2/16523 (EP,US);
B41J2/16511 (EP,US);
B41J23/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/01] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät | [2002/01] | English: | Ink jet recording apparatus | [2002/01] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97120574.5 / EP0850773 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0720912 (BROTHER INT [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 38 - column 8, line 9; figure - * [A] 2,11; | [XA]EP0635371 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 28 - column 7, line 11; figure - * [A] 11; | [A]EP0313204 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 3, line 1 - column 6, line 11; figures 1,3 *; | [A]EP0724959 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,11 * column 11, line 16 - column 13, line 10; figures 10,11 *; | [A]EP0480302 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 2,8 * column 24, line 43 - column 29, line 19; figures 16-20 *; | [A]EP0526209 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 12, line 59 - column 13, line 49; figures 9,10 * |