EP1300761 - Methods for upgrading or updating data and software on computers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tschabold, Brendan Zipartenstrasse 43 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2003/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/15] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01123267.5 | 04.10.2001 | [2003/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1300761 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2003/15] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/01] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Aufwerten oder Aktualisieren von Daten und Software auf Rechnern | [2003/15] | English: | Methods for upgrading or updating data and software on computers | [2003/15] | French: | Méthodes pour mettre à niveau ou mettre à jour des données et des logiciels sur des ordinateurs | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 06.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.11.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9425924 (NOVADIGM INC [US], et al) [X] 6 * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 13 *; | [XA]US5619716 (NONAKA NAOMICHI [JP], et al) [X] 11,13,14 * column 6, line 36 - column 9, line 58 * [A] 1-10,12; | [A]US5951639 (MACINNIS ALEXANDER G [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 17 - line 49 *; | [A]US6006034 (HEATH CLIFFORD [AU], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 28 - column 7, line 4 *; | [A]GB2346986 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 6 *; | [A]US6128734 (GROSS DANNY B [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 4, line 6 - line 27 * |