EP1197451 - Method for controlling an air knife and the vacuum for improving paper pick up in a vacuum paper feed system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, FR, LI | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dobbertin, Michael T. 292 East Lake Road Honeoye, NY 14471 / US | 02 /
Sciurba, Thomas K. 1127 Stonegate Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | WAGNER & GEYER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Franzen, Peter, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG, Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123359.0 | 10.10.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | US20000688000 | 14.10.2000 Original published format: US 688000 | [2002/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1197451 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1197451 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197451 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/12, B65H3/48, B65H7/16 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
B65H3/128 (EP,US);
B65H3/48 (EP,US);
B65H7/16 (EP,US);
B65H2515/34 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B65H2515/34, B65H2220/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2004/32] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Luftmesser- und Unterdruckluftsteuerungsverfahren zur Verbesserung der Papiererfassung für einen Unterdruckluftpapiervorschub | [2002/16] | English: | Method for controlling an air knife and the vacuum for improving paper pick up in a vacuum paper feed system | [2002/16] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un couteau à air et de la dépression pour améliorer le prélèvement de papier dans un système d'alimentation à vide de papier | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2008 | 28.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.03.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/14] | IT | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4451028 (HOLMES MAURICE F [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9,10,15 * column 5, line 58 - line 65 ** column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 1; figure - *; | [X]US4887805 (HERBERT GLENN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,15 * column 7, line 4 - line 24 * * column 8, line 3 - line 10 * * column 8, line 34 - line 49 * * column 9, line 11 - line 17; figure - *; | [X]EP0598272 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-10,15 * column 36; figures 45,46 *; | [XD]US5344133 (JANTSCH GREGORY R [US], et al) [XD] 15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5634634 (DOBBERTIN MICHAEL T [US], et al) [A] 1,2,9,10,15 * figures 3,4,12 *; | [X]US5645274 (UBAYASHI SHINSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10,15 * figures 17,19 * |