EP1298799 - Digital filter realization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2007/24] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Sony Deutschland GmbH Hugo-Eckener-Strasse 20 50829 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states Sony International (Europe) GmbH Kemperplatz 1 10785 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nöthlings, Rolf Advanced Techn.Ct. Stuttgart Sony Deutschland GmbH Hedelfingerstrasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Wildhagen, Jens Advanced Techn.Ct. Stuttgart Sony Deutschland GmbH Hedelfingerstrasse 61 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/08] |
Former [2003/14] | 01 /
Nöthlings, Rolf, Advanced Techn.Ct. Stuttgart Sony Int. (Europe) GmbH, Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
Wildhagen, Jens, Advanced Techn.Ct. Stuttgart Sony Int. (Europe) GmbH, Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 1 70327 Stuttgart / DE | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123468.9 | 28.09.2001 | [2003/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298799 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298799 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H03H17/06 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
H03H17/06 (EP,US);
H03H17/0225 (EP,US);
H03H2017/0245 (EP,US);
H03H2218/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Realisierung eines digitalen Filters | [2003/14] | English: | Digital filter realization | [2003/14] | French: | Réalisation d'un filtre numérique | [2006/40] |
Former [2003/14] | Réalisation d'un filtre digital | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3111889 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * page 7, lines 6-8 * * page 9, lines 13-19 * * page 9, lines 27-29 * * page 10, lines 26-28 * * page 11, lines 11,12 * * figure 1; table PAGE10 *; | [Y]US3930147 (BELLANGER MAURICE GEORGES, et al) [Y] 1-4,7-10,12 * column 1, lines 1-11 * * column 2, lines 29-34 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US4779128 (JOHANNES KURT-JOACHIM [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-10,12 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, lines 24-27,36 * * column 3, lines 40,41,58,59 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0774835 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-10,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0977359 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5594675 (PENG YUNG-CHOW [TW]) [A] 1-12 * figure 7 * * column 2, lines 14,19-32 * |