EP1193151 - Apparatus for detecting rotational state of wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8650 / JP | |||
Former [2002/14] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-6850 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Noritaka Toyota Jidosha K. K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Ota, Toshinobu 301 KC Biru, Ono Hitsuji, Saya-cho Ama-gun, Aichi 496-0922 / JP | 03 /
Ishida, Yasuhito 305 Ai Town Izumi, 50, Hachibe, Izumi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1224 / JP | [2002/14] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/14] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01123483.8 | 28.09.2001 | [2002/14] | Priority number, date | JP20000300182 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000300182 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1193151 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1193151 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193151 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00, G01P3/487, G01P13/04 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G01P13/045 (EP,US);
B60T8/171 (EP,US);
G01P21/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erkennen des Drehzustandes eines Rades | [2002/14] | English: | Apparatus for detecting rotational state of wheel | [2002/14] | French: | Dispositif pour détection de l'état de rotation d'une roue | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 01.03.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4331917 (RENDER MICHAEL L, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 36 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 33; figures 1,3 * [Y] 3,7,8; | [X]DE3733136 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 33 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 12 *; | [X]JPS59224569 ; | [Y]DE19650935 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 3,7,8 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 52; claim 11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850502), vol. 009, no. 101, Database accession no. (P - 353), & JP59224569 A 19841217 (MITSUBISHI DENKI KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * |