EP1199141 - Manufacturing method for hollow panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inagaki, Takayoshi, c/o Yamaha Corporation 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124055.3 | 09.10.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000315075 | 16.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000315075 | JP20000333794 | 31.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000333794 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199141 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199141 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199141 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B27N5/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B27N5/02 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1002 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/40] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Hohlkammerplatte | [2002/17] | English: | Manufacturing method for hollow panel | [2002/17] | French: | Procédé pour produire un panneau creux | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 23.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 06.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9803747 (EELA HARRI [FI], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 4, paragraph 2; claims 1,2 * * page 5, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [X]DE864632 (HOLZWERKE H WILHELMI) [X] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19843493 (IHD INST FUER HOLZTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [A] 1,2,6-10 * page 2, line 39 - line 40; example . *; | [A]US5183616 (HEDRICK THOMAS W [US]) [A] 5 * figure 3A *; | [A]US3956555 (MCKEAN HERBERT B) |