19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
28.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
13.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] |
25.02.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
25.02.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
31.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
03.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] |
12.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] |
05.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
08.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
19.03.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
12.03.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.03.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.11.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.09.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
09.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2005 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
08.07.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.04.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.01.2003 |
First examination report |
|
13.12.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
19.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
22.03.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] |