EP1203933 - Sensor device for measuring at least one variable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co. KG Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states FESTO AG & Co Ruiter Strasse 82 73734 Esslingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Dietmar Buchhartweg 2 73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Medow, Ralf Heilbronner Strasse 26 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2002/19] | Representative(s) | Kocher, Mark Werner, et al Magenbauer & Kollegen Patentanwälte Plochinger Straße 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Kocher, Mark Werner, et al Magenbauer & Kollegen Patentanwälte Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | ||
Former [2002/19] | Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01124085.0 | 10.10.2001 | [2002/19] | Priority number, date | DE2000154288 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10054288 | [2002/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1203933 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1203933 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01D18/00 | [2002/19] | CPC: |
G01D18/006 (EP,US);
G01D18/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/19] | Title | German: | Sensoranordnung zur Erfassung wenigstens eines Messwerts | [2002/19] | English: | Sensor device for measuring at least one variable | [2002/19] | French: | Dispositif capteur pour la mesure d'au moins une grandeur | [2002/19] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 20.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05014403.9 / EP1593939 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.04.2010 | DK | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | IE | 21.04.2010 | NL | 21.04.2010 | SE | 21.04.2010 | TR | 21.04.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | ES | 01.08.2010 | PT | 23.08.2010 | AT | 10.10.2010 | LU | 10.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 10.10.2010 | ||
LU | 10.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
AT | 10.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
PT | 23.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
IE | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 21.04.2010 | |
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | FI | 21.04.2010 | |
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 21.04.2010 | |
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | NL | 21.04.2010 | |
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 21.04.2010 | |
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 21.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4845649 (ECKARDT DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 5 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, line 18 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]DE4022697 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1* column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 25 *; | [X]WO9822781 (A B ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph L - page 16, paragraph 2 * |